LADY ALICE MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.69k £21.17k £19.21k £28.17k £25.15k
Total expenditure £13.21k £15.98k £28.51k £19.65k £11.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £480 £550 £4.50k £2.44k £11.57k