LADY ALICE MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Mary Godin Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
RICHARD JONES Trustee 22 July 2012 None on record
MAUREEN SYLVIA JAMES Trustee None on record
KIM BRISTOW Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Kevin Comer Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
Stephen Williams Chair 14 April 2014 None on record
Robert Croft Trustee 09 August 2020 None on record
Richard Piper Trustee 23 August 2020 None on record
Peter Hounsell Trustee 14 April 2014 None on record
David Derbyshire Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
Clare Murphy Trustee 26 July 2020 None on record