HUISH CHAMPFLOWER VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.25k £3.06k £3.94k £3.91k £16.65k
Total expenditure £6.80k £1.64k £2.05k £3.84k £4.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.57k