LEIGH-ON-MENDIP MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates to provide meetings etc. to the village members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 April 1963: Standard registration
- LEIGH-ON-MENDIP VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Gillian Taylor | Chair | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Turner | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Brooks | Trustee | 09 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DENIS PATTISON | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|||||
ROGER DAVID ORPWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA JEAN WIGMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN ORPWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.12k | £19.21k | £8.68k | £6.44k | £7.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.51k | £3.83k | £10.64k | £8.22k | £13.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 16.08.1950, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 22 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LEIGH-ON-MENDIP AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LEIGH-ON-MENDIP AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
YEW TREE COTTAGE
TADHILL
LEIGH UPON MENDIP
RADSTOCK
BA3 5QT
- Phone:
- 07845954708
- Email:
- LeighOnMendipHall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window