Accounts and annual returns MONTACUTE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 November 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 15 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window