OARE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall was sold in Feb 2010. In accordance with the terms of the original bequest the proceeds of sale are now held by the Trustees to be used for charitable purpoises to benefit the inhabitants of the parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew George Halliday | Chair | 29 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy James Syvret Payne | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOHN WOOLLACOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY JOHN RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HERBERT HENRY RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH AUGUST 1930
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF OARE AND CULBORNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MESSRS BEN HALLIDAY
Ashton Farm
Countisbury
LYNTON
EX35 6BL
- Phone:
- 01598741232
- Email:
- MGHALLIDAY@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window