ODCOMBE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to improve the conditions of life for the inhabitants of Odcombe and its surrounding area by providing a suitable venue for meetings, lectures, classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure such as whist, short mat bowls, keep fit, football, karate, walkers, sewing, tea dances, luncheons, suppers and quiz nights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 26 November 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Vanessa Davies | Chair | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl David Johnson | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Katherine Damon | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Cumming | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANN DUNFORD | Trustee | 02 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH CLOTWORTHY | Trustee | 02 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Glover | Trustee | 01 October 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.54k | £23.87k | £24.82k | £31.52k | £24.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.57k | £21.68k | £15.85k | £24.70k | £36.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £14.07k | £9.61k | £3.92k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 1 JANUARY 1989
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ODCOMBE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ODCOMBE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Westbury Gardens
Higher Odcombe
YEOVIL
Somerset
BA22 8UR
- Phone:
- 01935863444
- Email:
- OdcombeVillageHall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window