SPAXTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 304633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 10 October 2016 On time Download