SPAXTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 304633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Reynolds Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
ALISON MARGARET JARAH Trustee None on record
COLIN FOXHALL Trustee 19 January 2015 None on record
JENNIFER ROSE HILL Trustee None on record
SIMON CHRISTOPHER HASWELL Trustee 11 January 2016 None on record
KEITH ANTHONY BELLINGER Trustee None on record
MICHAEL JOHNSON Trustee None on record
MRS JACKIE LOXTON Trustee None on record
ANNE ELIZABETH MILNE RGN Trustee None on record
Janet Hodson Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
Gail Wainwright Trustee 31 August 2018 None on record
Simon John Stretton Trustee 11 December 2016 None on record
Leane Coles Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
RODNEY EDMUND GEORGE PARISH Trustee 31 March 2011 None on record
KIM BELLINGER Trustee None on record
MRS GILLY THOMAS Trustee None on record
SHARON LINDA CARVER Trustee None on record
GLYN KENNETH RICHARDS Chair None on record
JOSHUA JOHN SCHWIESO Trustee 16 March 2015 None on record
Nicholas Henry Rigden Trustee 03 February 2020 None on record
Doreen Rhoda Harris Trustee 25 October 2013 None on record
PHILIP SEVIER HAM Trustee 17 April 2011 None on record