Accounts and annual returns BACTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304702
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 March 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required