SOMERSHAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.85k £11.28k £6.21k £3.21k £13.05k
Total expenditure £2.18k £6.99k £8.69k £2.76k £2.30k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.65k N/A N/A N/A