THE SUFFOLK COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS

Charity number: 304848
Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £35.74k £37.12k £41.62k £29.50k £29.38k
Total expenditure £24.36k £30.74k £31.50k £27.74k £28.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A