BARDWELL PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
andrew perkins Trustee 15 July 2015 None on record
barry felton Trustee 15 May 2015 None on record
Mike Allum Trustee 14 May 2015 None on record
Simone Newson Trustee 23 May 2017 None on record
Kit Wells Trustee 10 May 2016 None on record
Neil Kellett Trustee 15 May 2015 None on record
STEPHEN LARDER Trustee 11 August 2013 None on record
Geoff Clough Trustee 23 May 2017 None on record
PETER SANDERSON Chair
BURY ST.EDMUNDS METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Jan Tomlinson Trustee 08 May 2018 None on record
matt cook Trustee 14 September 2015 None on record
mike bareham Trustee 14 May 2015 None on record