BARNINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.35k £5.67k £4.92k £7.13k £5.14k
Total expenditure £5.46k £3.02k £4.13k £5.25k £4.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A