BARROW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £14.13k £15.09k £15.02k £18.02k £20.76k
Total expenditure £10.99k £15.05k £19.63k £14.35k £8.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k