BOXFORD COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 304862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Waspe Trustee 15 January 2018 None on record
Sandra Ann Perry Trustee 15 January 2018 None on record
HOWARD CHARLES BAKER Chair 05 October 2012 None on record
ALAN ROBERT LEEDER Trustee 28 April 2014 None on record
Trudi Vanessa Wild Trustee 25 April 2016 None on record
John Bernard Weiland Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Roger Denis Molyneux Trustee 02 August 2019 None on record
STEPHANIE MARGARET ATKINS Trustee None on record
Evan Flockhart Trustee 15 July 2021 None on record
MAJOR GENERAL DAVID LESLIE BURDEN CB CVO CBE Trustee 28 April 2014
THE HONG KONG LEP TRUST Received: On time
PRIMROSE TINA SUSANNE LOOSE Trustee 05 October 2012 None on record
MARK PATRICK MILLER Trustee None on record
Susan Mary Price Trustee 15 July 2021 None on record