Accounts and annual returns THE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 February 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1174 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required