Accounts and annual returns WHELNETHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 304890
Charity reporting is overdue by 174 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 174 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 174 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 December 2023 324 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 December 2023 324 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 May 2023 457 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 May 2023 457 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2022 436 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 April 2022 436 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2021 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2021 364 days late Download Open in new window