THE NEDGING WITH NAUGHTON VILLAGE HALL AND COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 304930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.81k £3.01k £4.77k £4.65k £14.79k
Total expenditure £3.54k £2.98k £2.96k £5.39k £7.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.33k