THE NEDGING WITH NAUGHTON VILLAGE HALL AND COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nedging with Naughton Village Hall provides a location for community activities in these rural villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 May 1967: Standard registration
- 29 April 2013: Funds received from 273484 THE NEDGING WITH NAUGHTON COMMUNITY COUNCIL
- NEDGING WITH NAUGHTON VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEILA GOODMAN | Chair | 27 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth MacKenzie O'Connell | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gary Anthony London | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Caroline Raison | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HARDING | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY RUPERT GOODMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.65k | £14.79k | £52.53k | £55.09k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.39k | £7.46k | £56.99k | £57.43k | £9.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £11.99k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 31/12/1936 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/03/2014 as amended on 22 Mar 2022 as amended on 21 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDING IN NEDGING WITH NAUGHTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING EDUCATION AND FURTHERING HEALTH OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH ARE NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED IN LAW TO BE CHARITABLE BY IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED.
Area of benefit
NEDGING WITH NAUGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEIGHAM
NEDGING ROAD
NEDGING TYE
IPSWICH
IP7 7HW
- Phone:
- 01449 741306
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window