ADDLESTONE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LOCAL GROUPS AND OTHER CHARITIES, PRIVATE HIRE AND OTHER PERSONAL ACTIVITIES. ENCOURAGE SPECIFIC RECREATIONAL GROUPS BY OFFERING 'SECTION' MEMBERSHIP. ORGANISE EVENTS FOR THE ENJOYMENT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY WHICH ALSO PROVIDES ADDITIONAL INCOME TOWARDS THE UPKEEP OF THE CENTRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £2,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People
9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 October 1967: Standard registration
- ADDLESTONE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Bungard | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
June Tilbury | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steven Barabash | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM SMITH | Trustee | 01 April 1985 |
|
|
||||
MONICA KITCHENSIDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHELAGH MCKAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL BAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID STRIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA SALT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.80k | £155.72k | £72.58k | £181.07k | £151.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.82k | £198.76k | £146.70k | £186.26k | £158.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.90k | £4.90k | £29.70k | £19.76k | £2.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 October 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 04.05.1967. CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 3RD APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED 22ND MAY 2000, 8TH JANUARY 2001 AND 15TH SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ADDLESTONE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Area of benefit
ADDLESTONE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADDLESTONE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
COMMUNITY CENTRE
GARFIELD ROAD
ADDLESTONE
KT15 2NJ
- Phone:
- 01932843646
- Website:
-
addlestonecommunityassociation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window