BANSTEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KENNETH NOEL PREECE Trustee None on record
MALCOLM CUNNINGS Trustee
BANSTEAD COMMUNITY CHURCH Received: 1 day late
Malcolm Ash Trustee 15 March 2017 None on record
William Benjamin Mills Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
DIANA MARGARET BOWES Trustee None on record
SAM WALSH Trustee
BANSTEAD UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
Frederick Gillespie Trustee 31 October 2015 None on record
MAURICE TREVOR OWEN Trustee
AGE CONCERN (BANSTEAD) Received: On time
Gail Fraser Trustee 25 January 2019 None on record
Robert Collier Trustee 20 March 2018 None on record
MICHAEL RICHARD FOX CARTWRIGHT Chair None on record
Alan Frost Trustee 28 October 2016 None on record
David Talbot Trustee 15 February 2019 None on record
Anne Furness Trustee 20 January 2021
U3A - BANSTEAD AREA Received: On time
BARBARA BELCHER Trustee None on record
David Crowley Trustee 18 March 2020 None on record
Anne Ford Trustee 18 March 2015 None on record
DAVID STANLEY PETERKEN Trustee None on record
John Hayns Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
RODERICK ARTHUR McFARLANE Trustee 01 September 2020
BANSTEAD ARTS FESTIVAL SOCIETY Overdue by 211 days