Financial history NEW HAW & WOODHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304998
Charity reporting is overdue by 1636 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £53.79k £50.63k £54.45k £78.82k £50.05k
Total expenditure £45.06k £46.24k £42.16k £63.57k £56.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A