Accounts and annual returns EFFINGHAM VILLAGE RECREATION TRUST

Charity number: 305018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window