Financial history EFFINGHAM VILLAGE RECREATION TRUST

Charity number: 305018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £129.10k £177.38k £256.63k £163.54k £184.02k
Total expenditure £117.43k £128.66k £155.55k £168.23k £182.43k
Income from government contracts £12.00k N/A £43.50k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £45.94k £11.42k