THE ELLENS GREEN MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Memorial Hall provides an inexpensive venue for local activities, especially for minor sports and other activities for elderly people. It is used by many local clubs and societies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 05 June 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip Edwin Rapley | Chair | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Real | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Watts | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Vernon Bush | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Simon Goodchild | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIA JANE LILLEY | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|||||
ANDREW CHARLES HARDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TIM BLOOMFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS KATY RAPLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.77k | £18.45k | £10.16k | £13.25k | £16.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.83k | £8.90k | £7.01k | £8.50k | £29.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.91k | £300 | £300 | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 10 AUGUST 1948 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 22ND OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
ELLENS GREEN AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Briar Cottage
Horsham Road
Ellens Green
Rudgwick
HORSHAM
RH12 3AS
- Phone:
- 0771 007 8867
- Email:
- anthonyjwatts@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window