Accounts and annual returns LALEHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 31 May 2022 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 12 March 2021 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 12 March 2021 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 23 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 24 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window