Financial history LALEHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £28.81k £25.70k £27.90k £8.57k £21.77k
Total expenditure £22.82k £28.46k £26.14k £14.30k £21.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A