Financial history MAYFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £34.45k £34.90k £34.74k £37.92k £28.33k
Total expenditure £29.21k £32.33k £31.91k £33.63k £33.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.30k N/A £2.62k £10.62k