THE SURREY COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 305155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 June 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 June 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 June 2020 29 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 June 2020 395 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 June 2020 395 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 07 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 07 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download