THE SURREY COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 305155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £79.06k £61.46k £50.03k £80.65k £7.70k
Total expenditure £21.08k £46.50k £58.90k £53.11k £52.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A