THE SURREY COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 305155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Luke Smith Chair 06 March 2015 None on record
Simon Giles Farrant Trustee 06 October 2020 None on record
Stuart Watson Trustee 06 March 2015 None on record
Peter Bound Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
Lauren Dawes Trustee 21 June 2016 None on record
Sarah Atfield Trustee 03 October 2016 None on record
Neil John Fuller Trustee 07 October 2014 None on record