Accounts and annual returns THE SURREY COUNTY PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 305156
Charity reporting is overdue by 1535 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1535 days