THE SURREY COUNTY PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 305156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.48k £17.94k £25.33k £26.36k £18.71k
Total expenditure £21.08k £18.83k £28.18k £32.62k £24.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A