THE BEAT YOUTH SPORTS CLUB AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 305210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 10 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 18 March 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 18 March 2020 384 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 10 March 2020 741 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 10 March 2020 1106 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required