THE BEAT YOUTH SPORTS CLUB AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 305210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £947 £1.42k £1.13k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £829 £1.23k £1.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A