Accounts and annual returns EWHURST AND STAPLECROSS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required