Financial history KING GEORGE'S FIELD, MOUNTFIELD

Charity number: 305281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £812 £800 £803 £825 £500
Total expenditure £572 £266 £517 £648 £520
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A