POLEGATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 305293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 10 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 August 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 August 2020 11 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 19 November 2019 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 19 November 2019 112 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 30 November 2016 On time Download