Trustees POLEGATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 305293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Pierce | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Dorothy Coleman | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Colin Alder | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Morrish | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ELLEN PAYNE | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ROGERS | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Brian Watkinson | Trustee | 01 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
Joan Shoesmith | Trustee | 28 February 1991 |
|
|
||||
John Hollingworth | Trustee | 01 October 1975 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP CHARLES COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.