THE ROBERTSBRIDGE YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 305294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required