VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.65k £13.11k £16.18k £20.78k £17.57k
Total expenditure £9.18k £12.24k £30.02k £16.30k £10.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k