VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CRISPIN RAFFAELLO BENUCCIO SALIMBENI MA Chair
STAPLEFIELD VILLAGE HALL CIO Received: 3 days late
ANGLO-ITALIAN SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF ANIMALS Received: On time
ANSTY VILLAGE CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
Maria Ivette Fielding Trustee 14 March 2013
STAPLEFIELD VILLAGE HALL CIO Received: 3 days late
GILLIAN CHILDS Trustee 25 September 2014
STAPLEFIELD VILLAGE HALL CIO Received: 3 days late
Keith James Butler Trustee 25 January 2019
STAPLEFIELD VILLAGE HALL CIO Received: 3 days late
GEOFFREY ROY CROSTA Trustee
STAPLEFIELD VILLAGE HALL CIO Received: 3 days late
Rev'd Dr Vladimir Nikiforov Trustee 12 September 2013 None on record
ANDREW WIMBUSH Trustee
STAPLEFIELD VILLAGE HALL CIO Received: 3 days late
Judith Ann Hodder Trustee 14 January 2019
STAPLEFIELD VILLAGE HALL CIO Received: 3 days late