THE BEATRICE DREWE TRUST

Charity number: 305314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £32.14k £28.70k £30.66k £33.67k £36.05k
Total expenditure £27.56k £33.74k £29.50k £33.67k £30.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £8.00k £8.00k £8.20k £8.00k