Accounts and annual returns THE WILLINGDON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 305331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 September 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required