CRICKET AND RECREATION GROUND AT CRAWLEY DOWN

Charity number: 305333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Not active

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WORTH PARISH COUNCIL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £213 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2025 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2025 727 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2025 1092 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Worth Parish Council
Borers Arms Road
Copthorne
CRAWLEY
RH10 3ZQ
Phone:
01342713407
Website:

No information available