WEST MEADS COMMUNITY CENTRE & ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 305338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £29.33k £29.42k £32.02k £29.19k £27.50k
Total expenditure £21.75k £37.66k £21.32k £30.90k £25.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k