Accounts and annual returns COWFOLD RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 305356
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required