THE EASTERGATE VILLAGE WAR MEMORIAL HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable services, including indoor sports, religious meetings, dance and entertainment and private parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 September 1963: Standard registration
- 10 October 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1170248 Barnham and Eastergate Community Trust
- EASTERGATE PARISH HALL (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.14k | £15.22k | £12.79k | £23.81k | £33.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.88k | £17.30k | £14.02k | £21.86k | £21.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.61k | £2.88k | £0 | £11.25k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 20 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 29 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 19 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29TH DECEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF EASTERGATE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EASTERGATE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window