FELPHAM MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 01 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 06 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required